Global Patent Index - EP 1159289 A1

EP 1159289 A1 2001-12-05 - CHEMICAL SYNTHESIS AND USE OF SOLUBLE MEMBRANE PROTEIN RECEPTOR DOMAINS

Title (en)

CHEMICAL SYNTHESIS AND USE OF SOLUBLE MEMBRANE PROTEIN RECEPTOR DOMAINS

Title (de)

CHEMISCHE SYNTHESE UND VERWENDUNG VON LÖSLICHEN MEMBRANPROTEINREZEPTORDOMÄNEN

Title (fr)

SYNTHESE CHIMIQUE ET UTILISATION DE DOMAINES DE RECEPTEURS DE PROTEINES MEMBRANAIRES SOLUBLES

Publication

EP 1159289 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00917838 A

Priority

  • US 0006297 W
  • US 12427299 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0053624A1] The invention relates to chemical synthesis of extramembranous receptor domains of membrane protein receptors, and compositions and methods that employ them. The extramembranous receptor domains include the soluble ligand-binding extracellular and cytosolic domains of membrane protein receptors. The extramembranous receptor domains of the invention are produced by ligating under chemoselective chemical ligation conditions first and second peptides of an extramembranous receptor domain of a membrane protein receptor, where the peptides have unprotected chemoselective reactive groups capable of forming a covalent bond therein between. The ligation product is exposed to a folding buffer having a chaotropic reagent and an organic solvent that approximates the water-lipid interface of a cell membrane. Exposure to the folding buffer is followed by isolation from the buffer of ligation product that binds to a ligand of the membrane protein receptor. The ligand-binding portion of the ligation product produced by this method represents folded extramembranous receptor domain. The invention is exemplified by total chemical synthesis of the N-terminal domain of the glucagon-like peptide 1 receptor, demonstration of its ability to bind to peptide ligand and characterization of its disulfide map.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 1/00; C07K 1/107; C07K 1/113; C07K 1/13; C07K 14/72; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 1/113 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); C07K 1/00 (2006.01); C07K 1/107 (2006.01); C07K 1/13 (2006.01); C07K 14/715 (2006.01); C07K 14/72 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 1/006 (2013.01); C07K 1/1075 (2013.01); C07K 1/1136 (2013.01); C07K 1/13 (2013.01); C07K 14/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053624A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0053624 A1 20000914; AU 3874800 A 20000928; AU 768118 B2 20031204; CA 2372164 A1 20000914; CN 1350544 A 20020522; EP 1159289 A1 20011205; JP 2002539136 A 20021119

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-02-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 1/113 20060101AFI20051221BHEP

2006-02-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 1/107 20060101ALI20051221BHEP

2006-02-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 1/13 20060101ALI20051221BHEP

2006-02-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 14/72 20060101ALI20051221BHEP

2004-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRYPHON THERAPEUTICS, INC.

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030828

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI