Global Patent Index - EP 1159340 A1

EP 1159340 A1 2001-12-05 - MONOLITHIC POLYMER COMPOSITION HAVING A RELEASING MATERIAL

Title (en)

MONOLITHIC POLYMER COMPOSITION HAVING A RELEASING MATERIAL

Title (de)

TRENNMITTEL FREISETZENDER POLYMERISCHER MONOLITH

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION POLYMERE MONOLITHIQUE RENFERMANT UN MATERIAU DE LIBERATION

Publication

EP 1159340 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99949720 A

Priority

  • US 9921587 W
  • US 15703298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0017260A1] The present invention includes processes and resulting structures for producing a modified polymer (25) having interconnecting channels (45). The interconnecting channels (45) act as controlled transmission passages through the polymer. A hydrophilic agent (35) is blended into the polymer so that it is distributed within the polymer. In one embodiment, an absorbing material (30) is blended into the polymer so that the absorbing material is distributed within the product. The product is solidified so that the hydrophilic agent (35) forms passages (45) in the product through which a desired composition is communicable to the absorbing material (30) that is entrained within the product. The solidified product may be used to form a desired shaped article such as plug type inserts (55) and liners (70) for closed containers, or it may be formed into a film, sheet (75), bead, or pellet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08L 23/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 5/18 (2006.01); B01J 20/28 (2006.01); B29B 7/48 (2006.01); B29C 45/16 (2006.01); B65D 81/26 (2006.01); C08J 9/26 (2006.01); C08L 23/02 (2006.01); C08L 23/10 (2006.01); C08L 69/00 (2006.01); C08L 77/00 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01); F26B 21/08 (2006.01); B29K 23/00 (2006.01); B29K 69/00 (2006.01); B29K 77/00 (2006.01); C08L 23/08 (2006.01); C08L 29/04 (2006.01); C08L 71/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 23/10 (2013.01); B01J 20/28014 (2013.01); B01J 20/28033 (2013.01); B01J 20/28042 (2013.01); B29C 45/16 (2013.01); B65D 81/264 (2013.01); B65D 81/266 (2013.01); C08J 9/26 (2013.01); C08L 23/02 (2013.01); C08L 69/00 (2013.01); C08L 77/00 (2013.01); F26B 21/083 (2013.01); C08L 23/0861 (2013.01); C08L 29/04 (2013.01); C08L 71/02 (2013.01); C08L 101/00 (2013.01); Y10S 521/905 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08L 23/10 + C08L 2666/22
  2. C08L 23/02 + C08L 2666/04
  3. C08L 23/02 + C08L 2666/14
  4. C08L 23/02 + C08L 2666/02
  5. C08L 69/00 + C08L 29/00
  6. C08L 77/00 + C08L 2666/04
  7. C08L 77/00 + C08L 2666/02
  8. C08L 77/00 + C08L 2666/14
  9. C08L 69/00 + C08L 71/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0017260 A1 20000330; AT 310048 T 20051215; AU 6253999 A 20000410; BR 9913884 A 20011016; CA 2344188 A1 20000330; CA 2344188 C 20120207; CN 1195791 C 20050406; CN 1290904 C 20061220; CN 1324379 A 20011128; CN 1576301 A 20050209; DE 69928447 D1 20051222; DE 69928447 T2 20060803; EP 1159340 A1 20011205; EP 1159340 A4 20040512; EP 1159340 B1 20051116; ES 2255302 T3 20060616; JP 2002526581 A 20020820; JP 2006274272 A 20061012; JP 2012036410 A 20120223; JP 2015120931 A 20150702; JP 6139584 B2 20170531; US 6316520 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-16 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 69928447

- Effective date: 20130516

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20051116

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20051116

2013-03-27 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20130208

2013-03-27 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20130208

2013-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-02-08 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69928447

2013-02-08 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 69928447

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120917

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120912

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120912

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: AIRSEC S.A

- Effective date: 20060816

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100918

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110913

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051116

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060917

2008-05-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: AIRSEC S.A

- Effective date: 20060816

2007-06-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AIRSEC S.A

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-09-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060918

2006-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2255302 T3

2006-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-04-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060417

2006-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2006-02-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060216

2006-02-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060216

2006-02-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060216

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69928447 P 20051222

2005-12-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-11-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-11-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-11-16 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-11-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-11-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CSP TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-05-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08L 23/10 A

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CSP TECHNOLOGIES INC.

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CSP TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE