Global Patent Index - EP 1159345 A1

EP 1159345 A1 2001-12-05 - HOMOSTRUCTURED MIXED ORGANIC AND INORGANIC CATION EXCHANGED TAPERED COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

HOMOSTRUCTURED MIXED ORGANIC AND INORGANIC CATION EXCHANGED TAPERED COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

GEMISCHT ORGANISCH, ANORGANISCHE KATIONEN AUSGETAUSCHTE, VERDÜNNTE, HOMOSTRUKTURELLE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS EFFILEES ORGANIQUES ET INORGANIQUES MELANGEES A ECHANGE DE CATIONS ET HOMOSTRUCTUREES

Publication

EP 1159345 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99904475 A

Priority

US 9902032 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08K 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 33/44 (2006.01); C08K 3/34 (2006.01); C08K 7/22 (2006.01); C08K 9/04 (2006.01); C08K 9/08 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1159345 A1 20011205; EP 1159345 A4 20030709; JP 2003512276 A 20030402

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060321

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040906

2003-07-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08K 9/04 A

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08K 9/08 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08K 3/34 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 01B 33/44 B

2002-02-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PINNAVAIA, THOMAS, J.

2002-02-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHI, HENG-ZHEN

2002-02-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LAN, TIE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE