Global Patent Index - EP 1159376 A1

EP 1159376 A1 2001-12-05 - LOW-PRESSURE HYDROCRACKING PROCESS

Title (en)

LOW-PRESSURE HYDROCRACKING PROCESS

Title (de)

HYDROCRACKEN BEI NIEDRIGEM DRUCK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'HYDROCRAQUAGE A BASSE PRESSION

Publication

EP 1159376 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99966258 A

Priority

  • US 9929745 W
  • US 22357498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0040675A1] A catalytic process is provided for converting a high boiling point range petroleum stream to distillate range product which includes contacting a petroleum feedstock having a boiling range from 600 DEG to 1100 DEG F with a hydrocracking catalyst having a zoelite component with a framework silica to alumina ratio of at least 200:1, preferaly 2000:1, and a hydrogenation component. The process is conducted under superatmospheric hydrogen partial pressure to effect at least 20 % conversion, with at least 50 % of the converted product remaining in the boiling range of 330 DEG to 730 DEG F.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 47/02; C10G 47/04; C10G 47/14; C10G 47/16; C10G 47/18; C10G 47/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 29/12 (2006.01); B01J 29/74 (2006.01); C10G 45/64 (2006.01); C10G 47/18 (2006.01); C10G 47/20 (2006.01); C10G 65/12 (2006.01); C10G 65/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 47/18 (2013.01); C10G 45/64 (2013.01); C10G 47/20 (2013.01); C10G 65/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0040675A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0040675 A1 20000713; CA 2353444 A1 20000713; EP 1159376 A1 20011205; JP 2002534557 A 20021015; US 2001001449 A1 20010524

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HATZIKOS, GEORGE, H.

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KILIANY, THOMAS, R.

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KIRKER, GARRY, WAYNE

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MO, W., THOMAS

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HATZIKOS, GEORGE, H.

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KILIANY, THOMAS, R.

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KIRKER, GARRY, WAYNE

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MO, W., THOMAS

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE