Global Patent Index - EP 1159400 A1

EP 1159400 A1 2001-12-05 - CULTURE OF MYCOBACTERIA

Title (en)

CULTURE OF MYCOBACTERIA

Title (de)

KULTIVIERUNG VON MYKOBAKTERIEN

Title (fr)

CULTURE DE MYCOBACTERIES

Publication

EP 1159400 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00907778 A

Priority

  • GB 0000760 W
  • GB 9904773 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0052139A1] The present invention provides a method of culture of mycobacteria which comprises culturing the mycobacteria, either in batch or continuous culture, with agitation and in the presence of sufficient detergent so that a substantially homogenous suspension of mycobacterial cells is maintained. According to a preferred method the mycobacteria are grown in continuous culture, at a temperature of 35 DEG C +/- 10 DEG C, at a dissolved oxygen tension of at least 1 percent, at a pH of 6.9 +/- 0.9, at a dilution rate of at least 0.02 h<-1> and with agitation in the presence of sufficient detergent to maintain a substantially homogenous suspension of single cells. The present invention also provides a growth medium for culture of mycobacteria, comprising a carbon source, a mitogen, trace elements comprising at least Mg, K, P and S, and a nitrogen source. According to a separate aspect of the invention, there is provided a method of culture of a mycobacteriophage, comprising culture of mycobacteria as described above, and contacting said mycobacteria with a mycobacteriophage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 1/00; C12N 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0052139A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0052139 A1 20000908; AU 2925500 A 20000921; AU 770840 B2 20040304; CA 2364579 A1 20000908; EP 1159400 A1 20011205; GB 9904773 D0 19990428; JP 2002537798 A 20021112

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040521

2004-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JAMES, BRIAN, WILLIAM

2004-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARSH, PHILIP,MICROBIOLOGICAL RESEARCH AUTHORITY

2004-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHADWICK, JAMES S.,MICROBIOLOGICAL RES. AUTHORITY

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEALTH PROTECTION AGENCY

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030708

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010822

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI