Global Patent Index - EP 1159419 A1

EP 1159419 A1 2001-12-05 - PROMOTION OR INHIBITION OF ANGIOGENESIS AND CARDIOVASCULARIZATION

Title (en)

PROMOTION OR INHIBITION OF ANGIOGENESIS AND CARDIOVASCULARIZATION

Title (de)

STIMULIERUNG ODER HEMMUNG VON ANGIOGENESE UND HERZVASKULARISIERUNG

Title (fr)

ACTIVATION ET INHIBITION DE L'ANGIOGENESE ET DE LA CARDIOVASCULARISATION

Publication

EP 1159419 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00912015 A

Priority

  • US 0005004 W
  • US 9905028 W
  • US 12395799 P
  • US 9912252 W
  • US 14475899 P
  • US 14569899 P
  • US 9920111 W
  • US 9921090 W
  • US 9928313 W
  • US 9928409 W
  • US 9928565 W
  • US 0000219 W
  • US 0004341 W
  • US 0004342 W
  • US 0004414 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0053757A2] Compositions and methods are disclosed for stimulting or inhibiting angiogenesis and/or cardiovascularization in mammals, including humans. Pharmaceutical compositions are based on polypeptides or antagonists thereto that have been identified for one or more of these uses. Disorders that can be diagnosed, prevented, or treated by the compositions herein include trauma such as wounds, various cancers, and disorders of the vessels including atherosclerosis and cardiac hypertrophy. In addition, the present invention is directed to novel polypeptides and to nucleic acid molecules encoding those polypeptides. Also provided herein are vectors and host cells comprising those nucleic acid sequences, chimeric polypeptide molecules comprising the polypeptides of the present invention fused to heterologous polypeptide sequences, antibodies which bind to the polypeptides of the present invention and to methods for producing the polypeptides of the present invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; C07K 14/47; C07K 16/18; C12N 15/62; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 7/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/62 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); C07K 14/4703 (2013.01); C07K 14/70578 (2013.01); C07K 16/18 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07K 2317/24 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01); C12N 2799/027 (2013.01); G01N 2800/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] MCNALLY E M ET AL: "Human epsilon-sarcoglycan is highly related to alpha-sarcoglycan (adhalin), the limb girdle muscular dystrophy 2D gene", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 422, no. 1, 23 January 1998 (1998-01-23), pages 27 - 32, XP004261767, ISSN: 0014-5793
  • [X] ETTINGER A J ET AL: "epsilon-Sarcoglycan, a broadly expressed homologue of the gene mutated in limb-girdle muscular dystrophy 2D.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY. 19 DEC 1997, vol. 272, no. 51, 19 December 1997 (1997-12-19), pages 32534 - 32538, XP002278470, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • See also references of WO 0053757A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0053757 A2 20000914; WO 0053757 A3 20011101; AU 3381600 A 20000928; AU 768694 B2 20040108; CA 2361849 A1 20000914; EP 1159419 A1 20011205; JP 2003531811 A 20031028; JP 2004154140 A 20040603; KR 100553300 B1 20060220

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080618

2007-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040526

2002-02-06 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI