Global Patent Index - EP 1159425 A1

EP 1159425 A1 2001-12-05 - DNA SEQUENCE OF A PROTEIN THAT IS SIMILAR TO FKBP

Title (en)

DNA SEQUENCE OF A PROTEIN THAT IS SIMILAR TO FKBP

Title (de)

DNA-SEQUENZ EINES FKBP ÄHNLICHEN PROTEINS

Title (fr)

SEQUENCE D'ADN D'UNE PROTEINE SEMBLABLE A LA PROTEINE FKBP

Publication

EP 1159425 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00915112 A

Priority

  • DE 0000506 W
  • DE 19907598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19907598A1] DNA sequence (I) containing the coding region for an FKBP (FK506-binding protein)-like protein (II) of Arabidopsis thaliana, has a 4 kilobase (kb) sequence, encoding a deduced 365 amino acid protein. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) a DNA (Ia) that hybridizes to (I) or to its fragments or derivatives formed by insertion, deletion or substitution and encodes a FKBP-like protein; (2) a plasmid, bacterium, yeast or plant cells containing (I), (Ia) or their fragments or derivatives; and (3) transformed plant cells (and transgenic plants regenerated form them) that contain (I), (Ia) or their fragments or derivatives, as part of a recombinant DNA introduced into the cell.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/29; C07K 14/415; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/05; C12N 15/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/415 (2006.01); C12N 15/29 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8298 (2013.01); C07K 14/415 (2013.01); C12N 15/8243 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0050598A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19907598 A1 20000824; AU 3654900 A 20000914; CA 2363816 A1 20000831; EP 1159425 A1 20011205; WO 0050598 A1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060109

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050628

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHULZ, BURKHARD

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYMPORE GMBH

2002-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHULZ, BURKHARD

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010822

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI