Global Patent Index - EP 1159447 A1

EP 1159447 A1 2001-12-05 - METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR INHIBITING FARNESYL DIPHOSPHATE SYNTHASE

Title (en)

METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR INHIBITING FARNESYL DIPHOSPHATE SYNTHASE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN VON VERBINDUNGEN, DIE ZUM INHIBIEREN DER FARNESYL-DIPHOSPHAT-SYNTHASE GEEIGNET SIND

Title (fr)

PROCEDES D'IDENTIFICATION DE COMPOSES SERVANT A INHIBER LA FARNESYLE DIPHOSPHATE SYNTHASE

Publication

EP 1159447 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00912106 A

Priority

  • US 0005338 W
  • US 12299799 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0052198A1] The present invention relates to methods for identifying compounds useful as inhibitors of farnesyl diphosphate synthase. More particularly, the compounds so identified are useful for inhibiting bone resorption. The present invention also relates to methods for inhibiting bone resorption in a mammal comprising administering to a mammal in need thereof a therapeutically effective amount of a farnesyl diphosphate synthase inhibitor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/48; A61K 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/663 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); C12Q 1/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/06 (2013.01); A61K 31/663 (2013.01); C12Q 1/48 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 31/663 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0052198 A1 20000908; AU 3389000 A 20000921; AU 775239 B2 20040722; CA 2362985 A1 20000908; EP 1159447 A1 20011205; EP 1159447 A4 20041103; JP 2002537819 A 20021112

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060327

2005-03-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050207

2004-11-03 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/48 A

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/00 B

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20011005;LT PAYMENT 20011005;LV PAYMENT 20011005;MK PAYMENT 20011005;RO PAYMENT 20011005;SI PAYMENT 20011005