Global Patent Index - EP 1159474 A1

EP 1159474 A1 2001-12-05 - ARTIFICIAL FUR AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE

Title (en)

ARTIFICIAL FUR AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE

Title (de)

KÜNSTLICHER PELZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

FOURRURE ARTIFICIELLE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1159474 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99900885 A

Priority

FI 9900023 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0044969A1] The invention relates to an artificial fur, in which staple fibres (3) are mechanically mixed to a base knitted fabric (1) formed of a yarn (1a), to protrude from the level of the base knitted fabric (1) and to form a pile on the outer surface of the artificial fur. The staple fibres (3) mixed to the base knitted fabric (1) are fixed to the base knitted fabric (1) by thermal binding by means of a plastic material softened and/or melted by the effect of heat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 27/00; D04B 1/02; D04B 9/14; D04H 1/48; D04H 1/54; D04H 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/02 (2006.01); D04B 9/14 (2006.01); D04H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/025 (2013.01); D04B 9/14 (2013.01); D04H 11/00 (2013.01); D10B 2501/044 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0044969A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0044969 A1 20000803; AU 2055199 A 20000818; CZ 20012505 A3 20011114; EA 003479 B1 20030626; EA 200100800 A1 20020829; EP 1159474 A1 20011205; SK 10122001 A3 20011203

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050618

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALTION TEKNILLINEN TUTKIMUSKESKUS

2005-03-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SUOKAS, ESA

2005-03-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PORRASSALMI, PAEIVI

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 03D 27/00 A

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 04H 11/00 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 04H 1/54 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 04H 1/48 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 04B 1/02 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 04B 9/14 B

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031001

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE