Global Patent Index - EP 1159487 A1

EP 1159487 A1 2001-12-05 - ABSORBENT PAPER PRODUCT COMPRISING TWO PLIES

Title (en)

ABSORBENT PAPER PRODUCT COMPRISING TWO PLIES

Title (de)

ZWEILAGIGES SAUGFÄHIGES PAPIERPRODUKT

Title (fr)

PRODUIT EN PAPIER ABSORBANT COMPRENANT DEUX PLIS

Publication

EP 1159487 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00900524 A

Priority

  • FR 0000007 W
  • FR 9900033 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2788066A1] The invention concerns an absorbent paper product with a basic weight ranging from about 20 to 80 g/m<2> comprising an embossed ply including raised designs consisting at least partly of discrete protuberances oriented inwards of the structure and a non-embossed ply. The invention is characterised in that the embossed ply has at least over part of its surface at least 30 protuberances per cm<2> whereof the top surface area is less than 1 mm<2> preferably less than 0.7 mm<2>.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 27/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 27/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 27/40 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1023 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24463 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24562 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24612 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0040800A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2788066 A1 20000707; FR 2788066 B1 20010216; AT 229594 T 20021215; CA 2357832 A1 20000713; CA 2357832 C 20080916; DE 60000977 D1 20030123; DE 60000977 T2 20030724; DK 1159487 T3 20030414; DK 1159487 T5 20101011; EP 1159487 A1 20011205; EP 1159487 B1 20021211; EP 1159487 B3 20100616; ES 2187436 T3 20030616; ES 2187436 T7 20110801; ES 2187436 T8 20110922; PT 1159487 E 20030430; TR 200101919 T2 20020321; US 6656569 B1 20031202; WO 0040800 A1 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180102

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180201

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160803

2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160705

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-10-03 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20100402088

- Effective date: 20160803

2016-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-08-22 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160131

2015-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150105

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-06-30 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Effective date: 20110321

2013-06-28 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Effective date: 20110321

2011-10-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60000977

2011-08-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60000977

- Representative's name: ZENZ PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE GBR, DE

2011-08-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60000977

2011-07-29 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Effective date: 20110321

2011-06-22 [REG DE R074] RE-ESTABLISHMENT ALLOWED

- Document: DE 60000977

- Effective date: 20110321

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100917

2011-03-21 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60000977

2010-10-21 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20100402088

2010-10-11 [REG DK T5] CORRECTED TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2010-09-22 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-06-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: REQUETE DE LIMITATION ACCORDEE

2010-02-04 [REG DE 8505] EP PATENT AMENDED AFTER LIMITATION PROCEEDINGS AT EPO

2009-01-21 [LIM1] LIMITATION IS ADMISSIBLE

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED AFTER OPPOSITION PERIOD

2004-04-23 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2004-04-16 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187436 T3

2003-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030310

2003-04-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-04-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400496

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000977 20030123

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-01-05 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030105

2003-01-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030105

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229594 T 20021215

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010306

2002-03-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ABSORBENT PAPER PRODUCT COMPRISING TWO OR THREE PLIES

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE