Global Patent Index - EP 1159500 A1

EP 1159500 A1 2001-12-05 - DEVICE AT FENCE SYSTEM TO CONNECT WIRE NETTING AND PROFILE MOULDING

Title (en)

DEVICE AT FENCE SYSTEM TO CONNECT WIRE NETTING AND PROFILE MOULDING

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG FÜR ZAUNSYSTEM ZUR BEFESTIGUNG VON GITTER UND PROFILFORMSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR CLOTURE PERMETTANT DE FIXER UN GRILLAGE ET DES MOULURES DE PROFILAGE

Publication

EP 1159500 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00906849 A

Priority

  • SE 0000271 W
  • SE 9900491 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0047845A1] Device at fence systems, comprising wire netting (1), moulding strips (2) having at least one longitudinally extending track (3) and fittings (9) for connecting wire netting and moulding strips. The tracks (3) of the moulding strips have an opening (4) which is restricted by two longitudinally extending wall parts (5, 6) inside which the track expands. The wire netting (1) has an outer edge part along which, at least partly, the outermost edge is a edge wire (8). This at a joining to a moulding strip (2) is introduced through an opening (4) of the track (3) and is moved to the side inside a first (5) of said wall parts (5, 6). The fittings (9) have a locking part (10) and a gripping part (11), that the locking part (10) projects from the gripping part (11) and is designed in such a way that it can be introduced through the opening (4) of the moulding strip in at least two opposite turning positions. The locking part (10) at its free end has a hook (14) or the like projecting in one direction, which hook is arranged to extend in the longitudinal direction of the opening in said turning positions. Said hook (14) is arranged to, in at least one of said locking positions at the turning of the gripping part (11) into one locking direction, enter into locking engagement underneath the second wall part (6), whereby the locking part (10) fix the edge wire (8) inside the first wall part (5). The fitting (9) can, at dismounting of the fence, be brought out off locking position by a simple turming movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 17/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/10 (2006.01); E04H 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/161 (2013.01); E04H 17/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0047845A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0047845 A1 20000817; AT 264973 T 20040515; AU 2840400 A 20000829; DE 60010062 D1 20040527; DE 60010062 T2 20050331; EP 1159500 A1 20011205; EP 1159500 B1 20040421; SE 513915 C2 20001127; SE 9900491 D0 19990211; SE 9900491 L 20000812

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ABB SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ABB TECHNOLOGY LTD., ZUERICH, CH

- Document: DE 60010062

2017-03-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60010062

- Representative's name: RGTH RICHTER GERBAULET THIELEMANN HOFMANN PATE, DE

2015-06-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ABB TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ABB AB, VAESTERAS, SE

- Document: DE 60010062

- Effective date: 20150505

2015-06-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ABB SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ABB AB, VAESTERAS, SE

- Document: DE 60010062

- Effective date: 20150505

2015-06-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60010062

- Representative's name: RGTH RICHTER GERBAULET THIELEMANN HOFMANN PATE, DE

- Effective date: 20150505

2015-05-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60010062

- Representative's name: RGTH RICHTER GERBAULET THIELEMANN HOFMANN PATE, DE

2011-10-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ABB AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: JOKAB SAFETY AB, KUNGSBACKA, SE

- Document: DE 60010062

- Effective date: 20110905

2011-10-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ABB TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: JOKAB SAFETY AB, KUNGSBACKA, SE

- Document: DE 60010062

- Effective date: 20110905

2011-10-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ABB SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: JOKAB SAFETY AB, KUNGSBACKA, SE

- Document: DE 60010062

- Effective date: 20110905

2011-10-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60010062

- Representative's name: RGTH RICHTER GERBAULET THIELEMANN HOFMANN PATE, DE

- Effective date: 20110905

2011-10-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60010062

- Representative's name: RICHTER WERDERMANN GERBAULET HOFMANN, DE

- Effective date: 20110905

2011-09-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60010062

- Representative's name: RICHTER, WERDERMANN, GERBAULET & HOFMANN, DE

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040921

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060210

2006-02-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060210

2005-11-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-10 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050210

2005-02-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050210

2005-02-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050210

2005-02-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050202

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-09-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-07-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60010062 P 20040527

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI