Global Patent Index - EP 1159513 A1

EP 1159513 A1 2001-12-05 - VALVE CONTROL FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

VALVE CONTROL FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VENTILSTEUERUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR

Title (fr)

COMMANDE A SOUPAPES POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1159513 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00988608 A

Priority

  • DE 0004014 W
  • DE 19963753 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0149981A1] The invention relates to a valve control for controlling a gas two-way valve provided for adjusting the output of an internal combustion engine by opening and closing the gas two-way valve. The invention also relates to a method for controlling the gas two-way valve, whereby the opening and/or closing of the gas two-way valve occurs according to a delay during the opening and/or closing of the gas two-way valve. In addition, the gas two-way valve alters a preset adjusting time over a long period of time in order to determine the delay time, and the opening and/or closing of the gas two-way valve is detected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/46 (2006.01); F01L 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0149981A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0149981 A1 20010712; DE 19963753 A1 20010712; DE 50012453 D1 20060511; EP 1159513 A1 20011205; EP 1159513 B1 20060322; JP 2003519315 A 20030617; US 6581557 B1 20030624

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141110

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141110

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141110

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50012453

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060706

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012453 P 20060511

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-03-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020114

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR