Global Patent Index - EP 1159518 A1

EP 1159518 A1 2001-12-05 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A STORAGE CATALYST OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING A STORAGE CATALYST OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES SPEICHERKATALYSATORS EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN CATALYSEUR ACCUMULATEUR DE MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1159518 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00991535 A

Priority

  • DE 0004549 W
  • DE 19963925 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0149994A1] The invention relates to an internal combustion engine (1), in particular for a motor vehicle, which is provided with a storage catalyst (12'). Said storage catalyst can be fed with and can discharge nitrous oxides. A temperature sensor (13, 14) is provided for measuring the temperature of the exhaust gas that flows through the storage catalyst (12') and/or for measuring the temperature of the storage catalyst (12'). The measured temperature is compared with a threshold value, using a control device (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F01N 3/08 (2006.01); F01N 3/18 (2006.01); F01N 11/00 (2006.01); F02B 75/12 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F01N 3/0814 (2013.01); F01N 11/002 (2013.01); F01N 2550/03 (2013.01); F02B 2075/125 (2013.01); F02D 41/1446 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01); Y02T 10/47 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0149994A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0149994 A1 20010712; DE 19963925 A1 20010712; EP 1159518 A1 20011205; JP 2003519324 A 20030617

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050617

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040517

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020114

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR