Global Patent Index - EP 1159526 A1

EP 1159526 A1 2001-12-05 - ACTUATOR FOR A FUEL INJECTOR

Title (en)

ACTUATOR FOR A FUEL INJECTOR

Title (de)

STELLANTRIEB FÜR EINEN KRAFTSTOFFINJEKTOR

Title (fr)

MECANISME DE COMMANDE POUR UN INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1159526 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00920356 A

Priority

  • DE 0000629 W
  • DE 19909539 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0052322A1] The invention relates to an actuator for a fuel injector, characterized by a bending-elastic transmission element (5) which is mounted between a control element (2) and a jet needle and has a conical cross-section. Said bending-elastic transmission element (5) cooperates on its lower side in a central area (513) with the jet needle and on its upper side in an external area (512) with the control element (2), and in addition is supported on a housing (1) in the fuel injector.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 51/06; F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0036 (2013.01); F02M 2200/701 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0052322A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0052322 A1 20000908; DE 19909539 A1 20001005; DE 19909539 C2 20010208; EP 1159526 A1 20011205; EP 1159526 B1 20050518

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50010351

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130301

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120331

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110825 AND 20110831

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-05-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010351 P 20050623

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-06-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-05-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE