Global Patent Index - EP 1159544 A1

EP 1159544 A1 2001-12-05 - CLUTCH AND ENGINE GEARBOX ASSEMBLY PROVIDED WITH SUCH A CLUTCH

Title (en)

CLUTCH AND ENGINE GEARBOX ASSEMBLY PROVIDED WITH SUCH A CLUTCH

Title (de)

KUPPLUNG UND MOTOR-GETRIEBE-EINHEIT MIT EINER SOLCHEN KUPPLUNG

Title (fr)

EMBRAYAGE ET UNITE BOITE DE VITESSES-MOTEUR DOTEE D'UN TEL EMBRAYAGE

Publication

EP 1159544 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00912540 A

Priority

  • DE 19910629 A
  • EP 0001826 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0053947A1] The invention relates to a clutch with a clutch controller (7) that can be linked with a gearbox via a gearbox-mounted contact surface (31), and a pressure plate (1) that pushes, in an engaged position, a driving disk (2) against a counter surface (3). For disengaging the clutch, said driving disk is moved by the clutch controller (7) into a disengaged position in which the pressure plate (1) does not push the driving disk (2) against the counter surface (3). Said clutch controller (7) comprises a pull mechanism (87) that pulls the pressure plate (1) from the engaged position to the disengaged position when the clutch is disengaged. The gearbox-mounted contact surface (31) is configured as a junction between the clutch controller and the gearbox at which the clutch controller can be released from the gearbox in the mounted state.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16D 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16D 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16D 25/085 (2013.01); F16D 25/083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053947A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0053947 A1 20000914; AU 3426700 A 20000928; DE 19910629 A1 20000928; DE 19910629 B4 20040212; EP 1159544 A1 20011205

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-11-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI