Global Patent Index - EP 1159564 A1

EP 1159564 A1 2001-12-05 - GAS FIRED BURNER APPARATUS

Title (en)

GAS FIRED BURNER APPARATUS

Title (de)

GASBETRIEBENDE BRENNVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL COMPRENANT UN BRULEUR AU GAZ

Publication

EP 1159564 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00906065 A

Priority

  • AU 0000128 W
  • AU PP895999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0052387A1] A gas fired burner apparatus including a housing (2) containing a burner (3) for combustion of a fuel/air mixture for heat transfer therefrom, the housing including an interior air supply region for receiving ambient air for delivery as primary air in a combustible fuel/air mixture to said burner, said air supply region being located within said housing in heat transfer proximity with said burner, and primary air temperature control means to positively control the temperature range of the primary air delivery to said fuel/air mixing means so as to reduce pre-heating effects on the primary air due to operation of the burner apparatus when compared with an identical apparatus not having said temperature control means.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 7/00; F23D 14/46; F23L 1/00; F23N 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/46 (2006.01); F24H 1/20 (2006.01); F24H 3/04 (2006.01); F23N 5/00 (2006.01); F23N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/205 (2013.01); F23D 14/46 (2013.01); F24H 3/0488 (2013.01); F23N 5/006 (2013.01); F23N 5/10 (2013.01); F23N 2021/08 (2013.01); F23N 2033/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0052387 A1 20000908; AU PP895999 A0 19990325; CA 2363490 A1 20000908; EP 1159564 A1 20011205; EP 1159564 A4 20020904; JP 2002538406 A 20021112; MX PA01008774 A 20030327

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040527

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040216

2004-03-31 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

2004-03-17 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040115

2002-09-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24H 3/04 A, 7F 24H 1/20 B, 7F 23D 14/66 B

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE