Global Patent Index - EP 1159567 A1

EP 1159567 A1 2001-12-05 - HEATING PLANT

Title (en)

HEATING PLANT

Title (de)

HEIZANLAGE

Title (fr)

CHAUFFERIE

Publication

EP 1159567 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99958591 A

Priority

  • SE 9902045 W
  • SE 9803892 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0032992A1] A heating plant and a method for transferring heat from a first medium to a second medium, for example tap hot-water, and to a third medium, for example the surrounding air. The plant comprises at least one first heat generating arrangement (13) and one second heat generating arrangement (14) at a first circuit (11) containing the first medium, at least two heat transferring devices (25) arranged in series at a second circuit (12) containing the second medium, and at least one heat emitting device (18) for emitting heat to the third medium. A feeding conduit (16) connects the outlet (15) of the first heat generating arrangement with the inlet (17) of the heat emitting device and a return conduit (20) connects the outlet (19) of the heat emitting device with the inlet (21) of the second heat generating arrangement and the outlet (22) of the second heat generating arrangement with the inlet (23) of the first heat generating arrangement, and a first connection conduit (24), from a first point (1) located between the outlet (22) of the second heat generating arrangement and the inlet (23) of the first heat generating arrangement to a second point (2) located at the feeding conduit, connects the return conduit and the feeding conduit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/08; F24D 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/08 (2013.01); F24D 2200/02 (2013.01); F24D 2200/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0032992A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0032992 A1 20000608; AT 260446 T 20040315; AU 1592800 A 20000619; DE 69915139 D1 20040401; DE 69915139 T2 20041021; DK 1159567 T3 20040705; EP 1159567 A1 20011205; EP 1159567 B1 20040225; ES 2217848 T3 20041101; SE 513117 C2 20000710; SE 9803892 D0 19981116; SE 9803892 L 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141112

2016-03-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160301

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141111

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141111

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141111

2015-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141111

2015-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-08-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141111

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141111

2015-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 260446 T

- Effective date: 20141111

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-06-22 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-06-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150601

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69915139

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20131118

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131202

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131115

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20131125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: ENERGY MACHINES S.A., LU

- Document: AT 260446 T

- Effective date: 20120221

2012-03-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ENERGY MACHINES S.A., LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FOERSTA NAERVAERMEVERKET AB, BROMMA, SE

- Document: DE 69915139

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-03-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69915139

- Representative's name: ANDRAE WESTENDORP PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-01-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69915139

- Representative's name: ANDRAE FLACH HAUG, DE

2012-01-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ENERGY MACHINES, S.A.

- Effective date: 20111221

2011-11-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ENERGY MACHINES S.A., LU

- Effective date: 20111012

2011-10-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110929 AND 20111005

2011-10-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110922 AND 20110928

2011-09-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *ENERGY MACHINES S.A.196 RUE DE BEGGEN,L-1220 LUXE

- Effective date: 20110906

2011-09-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *ENERGY MACHINES S.A.

- Effective date: 20110906

2011-09-14 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-08-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ENERGY MACHINES S.A.

- Free text: FOERSTA NAERVAERMEVERKET AB#P.O. BOX 111 35#161 11 BROMMA (SE) -TRANSFER TO- ENERGY MACHINES S.A.#196, RUE DE BEGGEN#1220 LUXEMBOURG (LU)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040725

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-11 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217848 T3

2004-08-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-07-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO EDER AG

2004-05-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-05-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915139 P 20040401

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-25 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030116

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI