Global Patent Index - EP 1159573 A1

EP 1159573 A1 2001-12-05 - BRAZED-PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER AND AIR DISTILLATION DEVICE FITTED WITH SAID EXCHANGER

Title (en)

BRAZED-PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER AND AIR DISTILLATION DEVICE FITTED WITH SAID EXCHANGER

Title (de)

WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT HARTGELÖTETEN PLATTEN UND LUFTZERLEGUNGSANLAGE MIT DIESEM WÄRMETAUSCHER

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR A PLAQUES BRASEES ET APPAREIL DE DISTILLATION D'AIR EQUIPE D'UN TEL ECHANGEUR

Publication

EP 1159573 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00909400 A

Priority

  • FR 0000510 W
  • FR 9902503 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2790546A1] The heat exchanger can be used for the vaporization of a pressurized liquid and comprises at least one passage way (P) for a liquid extending in a first direction, being provided with exchange waves (7) that are substantially parallel to the first direction and comprising at least one redistribution area (5) associated with at least one lateral collector (6) in an intermediate area of the length thereof, in addition to being provided with deviation waves (8) extending in at least one second direction forming an angle with the first direction, whereby the redistribution area takes up the entire width of the passage way, in a crosswise position with respect to the first direction, whereby the deviation waves (8) communicate with the exchange waves (7). The deviation waves (8) are essentially as rigid as the exchange waves (7) . The invention can be used with exchangers in pumped air-distillation devices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 9/00; F25J 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/00 (2006.01); F25J 3/04 (2006.01); F28D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 5/002 (2013.01); F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F28D 9/0068 (2013.01); F25J 2245/50 (2013.01); F25J 2290/32 (2013.01); F25J 2290/44 (2013.01); Y10S 62/903 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0052408A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2790546 A1 20000908; FR 2790546 B1 20010420; CA 2363506 A1 20000908; CN 1187568 C 20050202; CN 1342258 A 20020327; DE 60017245 D1 20050210; DE 60017245 T2 20060223; EP 1159573 A1 20011205; EP 1159573 B1 20050105; JP 2002538409 A 20021112; US 6745828 B1 20040608; WO 0052408 A1 20000908

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-02 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090325

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

2007-04-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

2006-01-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-11-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20051004

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050404

2005-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017245 P 20050210

2005-02-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-01-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030728

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE