Global Patent Index - EP 1159576 A1

EP 1159576 A1 2001-12-05 - PITCHING SYSTEM WITH VIDEO DISPLAY MEANS

Title (en)

PITCHING SYSTEM WITH VIDEO DISPLAY MEANS

Title (de)

ABSCHIESSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER VIDEOANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE LANCEMENT MUNI DE MOYENS DE VISUALISATION

Publication

EP 1159576 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00908785 A

Priority

  • US 0004729 W
  • US 25972299 A
  • US 45780899 A
  • US 45780999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0052412A1] A pitching system is provided for throwing baseballs, softballs, and the like, which is synchronized to work in conjunction with a video display (304, 314) to permit a batter to view a moving pitcher (310) prior to and during delivery of the pitch. The machine includes a power head (12) having at least two and preferably three coacting wheels (72) for propelling a ball toward a batter. Three AC motors (80) and companion motor drives are provided for causing the wheels to rotate. The motor drives include dynamic braking circuits to permit rapid deceleration of the wheels. A pair of linear actuators (50, 60) is provided to permit the power head to be moved to predetermined horizontal and vertical positions. A programmable control unit (220) chooses the video image appropriate for a particular pitch and causes the wheels to rotate at appropriate speeds, and causes the machine to assume appropriate horizontal and vertical positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41B 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 69/40 (2006.01); G09B 19/00 (2006.01); A63B 69/00 (2006.01); A63B 69/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 69/406 (2013.01); G09B 19/0038 (2013.01); A63B 69/38 (2013.01); A63B 2069/0008 (2013.01); A63B 2069/402 (2013.01); A63B 2225/15 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0052412 A1 20000908; AU 3006300 A 20000921; AU 769744 B2 20040205; CA 2363550 A1 20000908; CA 2363550 C 20080429; CN 1188192 C 20050209; CN 1342260 A 20020327; CU 23025 A3 20050223; EP 1159576 A1 20011205; EP 1159576 A4 20051109; JP 2002537919 A 20021112; KR 100411754 B1 20031218; MX PA01008767 A 20030714

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080410

2008-10-03 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1042543

2008-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071129

2005-11-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050928

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI