Global Patent Index - EP 1159578 A1

EP 1159578 A1 2001-12-05 - SHOOTING SIMULATION METHOD

Title (en)

SHOOTING SIMULATION METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SCHUSSSIMULATION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE SIMULATION DE TIR

Publication

EP 1159578 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00912514 A

Priority

  • DE 19912093 A
  • EP 0001620 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19912093A1] The invention relates to a shooting simulation method, comprising barrelled weapons which fire ballistic projectiles. When a shot is simulated, the barrelled weapon (11) illuminates the target (13) using an optical transmitter (20) and a virtual impact of the projectile is determined, in order to establish a hit on target. The inventive method aims to reduce the production costs of the shooting simulation system and to ensure sufficient accuracy for the use thereof on the combat training range. To this end, the transmitter light is tightly concentrated optically and is pivoted successively on one plane. Information relating to the current position and vertical alignment (elevation) of the barrelled weapon (11) and the type of weapon and projectile is modulated on the transmitter light. In the target (13) which is equipped with an optical receiver device, the virtual projectile impact and the distance between the target (13) and the barrelled weapon (11) are determined from the weapon information that has been transmitted to the target (13) and from the known target position and are compared with one another, in order to establish a hit on target. If the information matches, a hit is displayed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41G 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41G 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41G 3/2655 (2013.01); F41G 3/265 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0057123A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19912093 A1 20000928; AU 3425200 A 20001009; AU 754674 B2 20021121; CA 2366526 A1 20000928; CA 2366526 C 20041005; EP 1159578 A1 20011205; EP 1159578 B1 20030416; WO 0057123 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50001795

- Effective date: 20110901

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-11-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1159578E

2003-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-10-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-05-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001795 P 20030522

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-04-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020408

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010804

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE