Global Patent Index - EP 1159579 A1

EP 1159579 A1 2001-12-05 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REPRESENTING A TARGET AND RECOGNISING HITS ON TARGET IN SHOOTING SYSTEMS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REPRESENTING A TARGET AND RECOGNISING HITS ON TARGET IN SHOOTING SYSTEMS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZIELDARSTELLUNG UND TREFFERERKENNUNG BEI SCHIESSANLAGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REPRESENTER DES CIBLES ET RECONNAITRE DES COUPS AU BUT DANS DES INSTALLATIONS DE TIR

Publication

EP 1159579 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00902584 A

Priority

  • DE 19909863 A
  • DE 29921081 U
  • EP 0000185 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0053998A1] The aim of the invention is to obtain images from an MPEG data flow which are fed to a subsequent processing device, i.e. for the representation of a target in shooting systems, whilst at the same time taking advantage of the digital storage medium DVD, recently introduced onto the market. To this end, the key frames of the data flow, which differ greatly in file size from the image modifications respectively allocated thereto, are filtered out and saved temporarily. These frames are then available for immediate processing. By triggering a pause or a skip-film function in the display device (7) resulting in determination of the image modification that is current at the time, it is also possible to link said image modification to the respective key frame that has been saved, whereby the individual current complete image that includes both the respective image modification and its corresponding key frame can be addressed and sent for subsequent processing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41J 9/14; F41J 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41G 3/26 (2006.01); F41J 5/00 (2006.01); F41J 5/02 (2006.01); F41J 5/08 (2006.01); F41J 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41J 5/08 (2013.01); F41G 3/2694 (2013.01); F41J 5/00 (2013.01); F41J 5/02 (2013.01); F41J 9/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053998A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0053998 A1 20000914; EP 1159579 A1 20011205; EP 1159579 B1 20030514; TR 200102602 T2 20020422

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070113

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070113

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-01-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050125

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002176 P 20030618

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020606

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE