Global Patent Index - EP 1159668 A2

EP 1159668 A2 2001-12-05 - INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT SYSTEMS AND METHODS

Title (en)

INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT SYSTEMS AND METHODS

Title (de)

INTERAKTIVE UNTERHALTUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE DIVERTISSEMENT INTERACTIF

Publication

EP 1159668 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00905848 A

Priority

  • US 0002342 W
  • US 11838499 P
  • US 30664799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0045250A2] Disclosed is an interactive entertainment system. The system includes a base (104a, 104b) that represents an entertainment device, a physical sensor object (106) that is separate from the base, a detector (102) arranged to detect the presence, location and identity of the sensor object (106) relative to the base (104a, 104b), and an interactive audiovisual program (112) configured to output audiovisual segments related to the entertainment device represented by the base (104a, 104b). Detection of the physical sensor object (106) causes the interactive audiovisual program (112) to output an audiovisual segment that is based at least in part upon the detected position of the sensor object (106) relative to the base (104a, 104b) and that includes information that is not visible on the base (104a, 104b) but which is deemed detectable by the sensor object (106).

[origin: WO0045250A2] Disclosed is an interactive entertainment system. The system includes a base (104) that represents an entertainment device, a physical sensor object (106) that is separate from the base, a detector (102) arranged to detect the presence, location and identity of the sensor object relative to the base, and an interactive audiovisual program (112) configured to output audiovisual segments related to the entertainment device represented by the base. Detection of the physical sensor object causes the interactive audiovisual program to output an audiovisual segment that is based at least in part upon the detected position of the sensor object relative to the base and that includes information that is not visible on the base but which is deemed detectable by the sensor object.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 3/00; A63F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/00 (2006.01); A63F 3/00 (2006.01); A63F 13/08 (2006.01); G06F 3/00 (2006.01); G06F 3/01 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G10L 13/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

G06F (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/214 (2014.09); A63F 3/00 (2013.01); A63F 13/428 (2013.01); G06F 1/00 (2013.01); G06F 3/00 (2013.01); G06F 3/01 (2013.01); G06F 17/30 (2013.01); G10L 13/00 (2013.01); G06F 3/0488 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0045250A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0045250 A2 20000803; WO 0045250 A3 20001228; AU 2746600 A 20000818; CA 2360940 A1 20000803; CN 1342275 A 20020327; EP 1159668 A2 20011205; JP 2002535794 A 20021022; KR 20020003364 A 20020112; NO 20013633 A 20010912; NO 20013633 D0 20010724; PL 349814 A1 20020909

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEGO A/S

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTERLEGO AG

2003-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020622

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011211

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEGO A/S

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTERLEGO AG

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI