Global Patent Index - EP 1159723 A1

EP 1159723 A1 2001-12-05 - SAFETY ADHESIVE FOIL AS IDENTIFICATION ELEMENT

Title (en)

SAFETY ADHESIVE FOIL AS IDENTIFICATION ELEMENT

Title (de)

SICHERHEITS-KLEBEFOLIE ALS IDENTIFIZIERUNGSTRÄGER

Title (fr)

FEUILLE ADHESIVE DE SECURITE SERVANT D'ELEMENT D'IDENTIFICATION

Publication

EP 1159723 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00910629 A

Priority

  • DE 19909723 A
  • EP 0000724 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19909723C1] The invention relates to an inscribable safety foil, especially for use in the field of motor vehicles, and to a method for inscribing said foil. The safety foil contains a diffusionable (7) identification medium that is released or fixed in a locally selective manner by means of a contactless inscription process. Once the safety foil has been glued on a substrate (14), the identification medium (3) produces a permanent marking of the substrate thereby ensuring unequivocal identification of the object concerned.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/03 (2006.01); B65D 79/02 (2006.01); G09F 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/00 (2013.01); B65D 79/02 (2013.01); Y10S 283/901 (2013.01); Y10S 428/916 (2013.01); Y10T 428/14 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1405 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1471 (2013.01); Y10T 428/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054243A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909723 C1 20000907; DE 19909723 C5 20040415; EP 1159723 A1 20011205; EP 1159723 B1 20040428; EP 1159723 B8 20090603; ES 2218136 T3 20041116; JP 2002539478 A 20021119; JP 4480118 B2 20100616; US 6953206 B1 20051011; WO 0054243 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130130

2014-03-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140324

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130129

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130129

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130129

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120120

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120206

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-04-15 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: TESA SE

- Effective date: 20110415

2010-04-22 [REG DE 8581] INVENTOR (NEW SITUATION)

2010-04-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-04-09 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2009-04-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2007-12-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-10-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2007-08-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218136 T3

2004-09-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2004-09-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TESA AG

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040628

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006254 P 20040603

2004-06-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2004-02-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TESA AG

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021001

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE