Global Patent Index - EP 1159727 A1

EP 1159727 A1 2001-12-05 - REVERSIBLE ELECTROCHEMICAL MIRROR FOR MODULATION OF REFLECTED RADIATION

Title (en)

REVERSIBLE ELECTROCHEMICAL MIRROR FOR MODULATION OF REFLECTED RADIATION

Title (de)

UMSCHALTBARER ELEKTROCHEMISCHER SPIEGEL ZUR MODULATION REFLEKTIERTER STRAHLUNG

Title (fr)

MIROIR ELECTROCHIMIQUE REVERSIBLE PERMETTANT DE MODULER UN RAYONNEMENT REFLECHI

Publication

EP 1159727 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99942046 A

Priority

  • US 9917990 W
  • US 9826610 W
  • US 33338599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0036580A1] An electrochemical mirror includes a transparent first electrode (106) and a second electrode (110). An electrolytic solution (112), disposed between the first and second electrodes, contains ions (116) of a metal which can electrodeposit on the electrodes. A negative electrical potential (118) applied to the first electrode causes deposited metal to be dissolved from the second electrode into the electrolytic solution and to be electrodeposited from the solution onto the first electrode, thereby affecting the reflectivity of the mirror for electromagnetic radiation (122). A surface modification layer (108) applied to the first electrode ensures that the electrodeposit is substantially uniform, resulting in a mirror layer which increases the reflectivity of the mirror. A positive electrical potential (118) applied to the first electrode causes deposited metal to be dissolved form the first electrode and electrodeposited from the solution onto the second electrode, thereby decreasing the reflectivity of the mirror.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/00 (2006.01); B60R 1/04 (2006.01); G02B 5/04 (2006.01); G02F 1/15 (2006.01); G02F 1/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/1506 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0036580 A1 20000622; CA 2355156 A1 20000622; CA 2355156 C 20040706; EP 1159727 A1 20011205; EP 1159727 A4 20020130; JP 2003522338 A 20030722

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080301

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041203

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041203

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-02-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROCKWELL SCIENTIFIC LICENSING LLC

2003-10-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INNOVATIVE TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROCKWELL SCIENCE CENTER, LLC

2002-01-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 09G 3/00 A, 7G 02F 1/15 B

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI