Global Patent Index - EP 1159741 A2

EP 1159741 A2 2001-12-05 - DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING A TONER IMAGE FROM A TONER SUPPORT TAPE TO A TONER MATERIAL WHILE MAINTAINING A CONSTANT TAPE TENSION

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING A TONER IMAGE FROM A TONER SUPPORT TAPE TO A TONER MATERIAL WHILE MAINTAINING A CONSTANT TAPE TENSION

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN EINES TONERBILDES VON EINEM TONERTRÄGERBAND AUF EIN TRÄGERMATERIAL UNTER BEIBEHALTUNG EINER KONSTANTEN BANDSPANNUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE TRANSFERER UN IMAGE TONER D'UNE BANDE SUPPORT DE TONER SUR UN MATERIAU SUPPORT EN CONSERVANT UNE TENSION DE BANDE CONSTANTE

Publication

EP 1159741 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00916924 A

Priority

  • DE 19910613 A
  • EP 0002136 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0054266A2] The invention relates to a device for transferring at least one toner image from a toner support tape (10) to a toner material (22). Said toner support tape (10) is guided in such a manner that the tape tension remains constant during the swiveling movement of a roller system (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/1665 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054266A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0054266 A2 20000914; WO 0054266 A3 20001228; DE 50014443 D1 20070809; EP 1159741 A2 20011205; EP 1159741 B1 20070627; JP 2002539484 A 20021119; JP 4430243 B2 20100310; US 6606475 B1 20030812

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50014443

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50014443

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130310

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130310

2013-10-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH, 85586 POING, DE

- Document: DE 50014443

- Effective date: 20130819

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50014443

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

- Effective date: 20130819

2013-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20130331

2013-08-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50014443

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130524

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080328

2007-12-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070912

2007-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014443 P 20070809

2007-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2007-06-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE