Global Patent Index - EP 1159748 A1

EP 1159748 A1 2001-12-05 - METHOD FOR MAKING A FLAT CABLE ELASTIC, RELATED EQUIPMENT AND CABLE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING A FLAT CABLE ELASTIC, RELATED EQUIPMENT AND CABLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ELASTIZITÄT BEI EINEM FLACHKABEL, VERWENDETE WERKZEUGE UND KABEL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR CONFERER UNE ELASTICITE A UN CABLE PLAT, OUTILLAGE ET CABLE ASSOCIES

Publication

EP 1159748 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00910778 A

Priority

  • EP 0001898 W
  • FR 9902788 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2790590A1] The invention concerns a method for making a flat cable (1) elastic, which consists in producing a series of accordion-like undulations (6) on said flat cable (1), along a first direction (Z) perpendicular to the main plane (XY) of the flat cable (1). The undulations (6) have a bending radius (7) at the top and at the bottom, selected to be greater than the thickness (5) of the flat cable (1). The equipment for producing said undulations (6) comprises two heated toothed wheels (25, 26). The invention is particularly useful for producing electrical harness designed to be fitted in a motor vehicle passenger compartment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054289A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2790590 A1 20000908; FR 2790590 B1 20040109; DE 60023271 D1 20051124; DE 60023271 T2 20060720; EP 1159748 A1 20011205; EP 1159748 B1 20051019; ES 2251972 T3 20060516; WO 0054289 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110304

2012-04-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120424

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070303

2006-09-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060720

2006-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2251972 T3

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060108

2005-11-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60023271 P 20051124

2005-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-10-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: S-Y SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGIES FRANCE SAS

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE EEDS SYSTEMS

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE