Global Patent Index - EP 1159765 A1

EP 1159765 A1 2001-12-05 - A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SOLAR CELLS

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SOLAR CELLS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SOLARZELLEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PILES SOLAIRES

Publication

EP 1159765 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00904935 A

Priority

  • DE 19904082 A
  • EP 0000397 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19904082A1] An economical method of coating organic-polymeric carrier materials with at least one film and tempering the thus coated materials, wherein the carrier material has a thickness of at least 60 mu m and consists of a polymeric material with a glass transition temperature of at least 90 DEG C, the applied film has a thickness of a maximum of 30 mu m, the coating is performed at temperatures below the glass transition temperature and the tempering is performed at temperatures of at least 250 DEG C by means of a plasma.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 31/18; H01L 31/0392

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 31/04 (2006.01); H01L 31/0392 (2006.01); H01L 31/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 31/1836 (2013.01); H01L 31/0392 (2013.01); H01L 31/03925 (2013.01); H01L 31/1864 (2013.01); Y02E 10/50 (2013.01); Y02P 70/521 (2015.11)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0046861A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19904082 A1 20000803; EP 1159765 A1 20011205; JP 2002536835 A 20021029; WO 0046861 A1 20000810

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070411

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061130

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE