Global Patent Index - EP 1159795 A1

EP 1159795 A1 2001-12-05 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE QUALITY OF A DIGITAL AUDIO SIGNAL BROADCAST WITH AN AUDIO-VISUAL PROGRAMME

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE QUALITY OF A DIGITAL AUDIO SIGNAL BROADCAST WITH AN AUDIO-VISUAL PROGRAMME

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR QUALITÄTSÜBERWACHUNG VON EINEM DIGITALTONSIGNAL DAS MIT EINEM RUNDFUNKPROGRAMM ÜBERTRAGEN WIRD

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DE LA QUALITE D'UN SIGNAL AUDIONUMERIQUE DIFFUSE AVEC UN PROGRAMME AUDIOVISUEL

Publication

EP 1159795 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00909432 A

Priority

  • FR 0000551 W
  • FR 9902821 A
  • FR 9904179 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0054441A1] The invention concerns a method for controlling the quality of a distributed digital audio signal. The digital audio signal (ADS) is subjected to a detection of spurious signals such as brief interruption (101), squeal (102), humming (103), left/right phase shift (104). A warning signal is produced (105, 106) if one at least of the spurious signals is present. The invention is applicable in radio and digital television broadcasting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/88 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/88 (2013.01); H04H 20/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054441A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2790900 A1 20000915; FR 2790900 B3 20010427; DE 60031767 D1 20061221; DE 60031767 T2 20070920; EP 1159795 A1 20011205; EP 1159795 B1 20061108; ES 2276671 T3 20070701; WO 0054441 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-02-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2008-10-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070809

2007-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2276671 T3

2007-03-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070215

2007-01-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FRANCE TELECOM

2007-01-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TDF

2006-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60031767 P 20061221

2006-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050128

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE