Global Patent Index - EP 1159828 A1

EP 1159828 A1 2001-12-05 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REDUCING DATA ERRORS IN DIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REDUCING DATA ERRORS IN DIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON DATENFEHLERN IN DIGITALER KOMMUNIKATION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE DIMINUTION D'ERREURS DE DONNEES DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS NUMERIQUES

Publication

EP 1159828 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00984272 A

Priority

  • US 0033711 W
  • US 45949599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143440A1] A system (10) for reducing data errors in a digital data stream includes a receiver (122), an error detection circuit (123), and a processor (100). One or more communication channels transmit redundant data slots to the receiver (122). In response to the redundant data slots, the error detection circuit (123) generates data valid signals corresponding to the communication channels. The data valid signals are set based on the contents of the redundant data slots. In response to the data valid signals from the error detection circuit (123), the processor (100) generates a non-redundant data stream including data slots selected from either of the incoming communication channels. In this manner, corrupted data slots can be removed, resulting in an output non-redundant data stream having fewer data errors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/173; H04L 1/00; H04N 7/08; H04N 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/173 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/17309 (2013.01); H04L 1/08 (2013.01); H04L 1/22 (2013.01); H04L 1/1607 (2013.01); H04L 2001/0094 (2013.01); H04N 7/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143440 A1 20010614; AU 2091801 A 20010618; EP 1159828 A1 20011205; EP 1159828 A4 20040818

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060516

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-08-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/173 A

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/16 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/08 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 1/00 B

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE

2002-02-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011214

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI