Global Patent Index - EP 1159853 A1

EP 1159853 A1 2001-12-05 - METHOD FOR SHAPING THE SPATIAL RECEPTION AMPLIFICATION CHARACTERISTIC OF A CONVERTER ARRANGEMENT AND CONVERTER ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SHAPING THE SPATIAL RECEPTION AMPLIFICATION CHARACTERISTIC OF A CONVERTER ARRANGEMENT AND CONVERTER ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR FORMGEBUNG DER EMPFANGSVERSTÄRKUNGSRAUMCHARAKTERISTIK EINER UMWANDLERANORDNUNG, UND UMWANDLERANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MISE EN FORME DE LA CARACTERISTIQUE D'AMPLIFICATION A RECEPTION SPATIALE D'UN CONVERTISSEUR ET LEDIT CONVERTISSEUR

Publication

EP 1159853 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00906119 A

Priority

  • EP 00906119 A
  • CH 0000118 W
  • EP 99104443 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1035752A1] So as to shape the spatial amplification characteristic of an acoustical to electrical converter arrangement at least two sub-arrangements (I, II) of converters are provided, generating different spatial amplification characteristics. Frequency domain converted signals (S/ SIMILAR 1) which are proportional to the output signals of the sub-arrangement are compared in a unit (39) on respective spectral frequencies (fs) and there is generated at the output of the comparing unit (39) a binary spectral comparison result signal (A39). Signals (S/ SIMILAR 2) which are as well proportional to the output signals of the sub-arrangements (I, II) are fed to a switching unit (41). For each spectral frequency (fs) the control signal from unit 39, as a binary spectral signal, controls the spectral amplitude of which of the two input signals (S/ SIMILAR 2) is passed to the output (A41) of the switching unit and of the arrangement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 3/00; H04R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/40 (2006.01); G10L 11/00 (2006.01); H04R 3/00 (2006.01); H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/005 (2013.01); H04R 25/407 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054553A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035752 A1 20000913; AU 2790500 A 20000928; AU 758366 B2 20030320; CA 2366992 A1 20000914; CN 1343436 A 20020403; DE 60042733 D1 20090924; DK 1159853 T3 20091123; EP 1159853 A1 20011205; EP 1159853 B1 20090812; JP 2002539492 A 20021119; US 6522756 B1 20030218; WO 0054553 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-10-26 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150331

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140317

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100517

2009-11-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-09-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60042733 P 20090924

2009-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2009-08-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI

2009-08-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI