Global Patent Index - EP 1159885 A1

EP 1159885 A1 2001-12-05 - Ratchet tensioning device for restraining band

Title (en)

Ratchet tensioning device for restraining band

Title (de)

Spannratsche für ein Gurtband

Title (fr)

Dispositif à cliquet pour retenir une bande

Publication

EP 1159885 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01109897 A

Priority

FR 0007118 A

Abstract (en)

The clip (23) for the binding (11, 12) of a snowboard has a tip (25) which cooperates with grooves on the binding to fasten it against a bridge section (19). It is released by a release button (30) which disengages the tip. When the clip is released the button is moved vertically away from the binding (12) to a position where the handle (27) of the clip is closest to the bridge (19).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 11/14; A41F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 11/14 (2006.01); A44B 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/06 (2013.01); A43C 11/1406 (2013.01); A43C 11/1433 (2013.01); A43C 11/1446 (2013.01); A43C 11/1453 (2013.01); A43C 11/148 (2013.01); A44B 11/125 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1159885 A1 20011205; EP 1159885 B1 20070124; AT 352221 T 20070215; DE 60126182 D1 20070315; DE 60126182 T2 20071115; FR 2809778 A1 20011207; FR 2809778 B1 20020906; JP 3082272 U 20011207; US 2002000707 A1 20020103

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080424

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070124

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070411

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071025

2007-04-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-04-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-04-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070412

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60126182 P 20070315

2007-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040322

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI