Global Patent Index - EP 1159887 A1

EP 1159887 A1 2001-12-05 - Foldable table

Title (en)

Foldable table

Title (de)

Klapptisch

Title (fr)

Table pliable

Publication

EP 1159887 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01112148 A

Priority

DE 10025338 A

Abstract (en)

The folding table has a carrier arm (15) mounted at the table leg (5) so that, when the table top (1) is moved from the working to the stowed position, the foot lever section (7) is wholly or partially swung with it. The carrier arm has or is a part of the two-part locking mechanism, where both parts lie against each other without play when the table top is in the working setting.

Abstract (de)

Ein verbesserter Klapptisch zeichnet sich durch die folgenden Merkmale aus der Tragarm (15) ist in der jeweiligen Standfußeinrichtung (5) mit der unteren Fußeinrichtung (5) zumindest so gekoppelt, dass bei Verschwenken des Tragarmes (15) von der die Arbeitsplatte (1) stützenden Betriebsstellung in Verstaustellung die Fußhebelabschnitte (7) oder ein Teil davon mitverschenkbar ist, an dem Tragarm (15) ist ein Teil des Verriegelungsmechanismusses ausgebildet bzw. der Tragarm (15) bildet einen Teil des Verriegelungsmechanismusses, die Verriegelungseinrichtung umfasst zwei zusammenwirkende Verriegelungselemente, nämlich eine mit der Tischplatte mitverschwenkbare erste Verriegelungselement und ein an der Tischkonstruktion und vorzugsweise an dem Tragarm (15) vorgesehenes zweites Verriegelungselement, die in Arbeitsstellung der Arbeitsplatte (1) spielfrei aneinander liegen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 3/00; A47B 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 3/08 (2006.01); A47B 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 3/0803 (2013.01); A47B 3/08 (2013.01); A47B 7/02 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0013 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1159887 A1 20011205; EP 1159887 B1 20031029; AT 252859 T 20031115; DE 10025338 A1 20011206; DE 10025338 B4 20040318

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180529

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180529

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100853

- Representative's name: FLACH BAUER STAHL PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2018-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: STEELCASE INC., US

- Effective date: 20160108

2015-11-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20151008 AND 20151014

2015-10-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STEELCASE INC., GRAND RAPIDS, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: STEELCASE WERNDL AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 83026 ROSENHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 50100853

2015-10-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100853

- Representative's name: ANDRAE WESTENDORP PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2015-10-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100853

- Representative's name: FLACH BAUER STAHL PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2015-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100517

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-12-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090519

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-14 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090504

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STEELCASE WERNDL A.G.

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040517

2004-05-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040517

2004-02-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040209

2004-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040129

2004-01-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040129

2004-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040129

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100853 P 20031204

2003-11-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEELCASE WERNDL AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020307

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI