Global Patent Index - EP 1159893 A2

EP 1159893 A2 2001-12-05 - Clothes drying, dewrinkling and ironing cabinet

Title (en)

Clothes drying, dewrinkling and ironing cabinet

Title (de)

Schrank zum Trocknen, Glätten und Bügeln von Wäsche

Title (fr)

Armoire de séchage, défroissage et repassage de vêtements

Publication

EP 1159893 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01103748 A

Priority

ES 200001365 A

Abstract (en)

A clothes drying, dewrinkling and ironing cabinet which comprises a main enclosure (2) for housing clothes, access to said main enclosure (2) being by way of a front door (3), means (4) for drying and dewrinkling the clothes in said enclosure (2) and control means for regulating said means (4), said cabinet also having an ironing board unit (6). This ironing board unit (6) is a folding one and is mounted on the inside of the door (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 77/10; D06F 58/10; D06F 81/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/10 (2006.01); D06F 58/10 (2006.01); D06F 73/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/10 (2013.01); D06F 58/10 (2013.01); D06F 73/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1159893 A2 20011205; EP 1159893 A3 20020731; ES 2189593 A1 20030701; ES 2189593 B1 20050816; US 2001048267 A1 20011206

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-05-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI