Global Patent Index - EP 1159896 A1

EP 1159896 A1 2001-12-05 - Pivotal fitting for furniture for sitting or lying on

Title (en)

Pivotal fitting for furniture for sitting or lying on

Title (de)

Schwenkbeschlag für ein Sitz- oder Liegemöbel

Title (fr)

Ferrure d'articulation pour meuble d'assise ou de couchage

Publication

EP 1159896 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810469 A

Priority

EP 00810469 A

Abstract (en)

The swivel fitment (1) consists of a U-shaped sectioned notch lever (2)on which on a connecting arm (4) between the two U-arms are notches. A swivel lever (6) is attached to the notch-lever, and a support lever (7) one end of which is linked to the swivel lever. The support lever's other end is guided on a control part (8) on the notch-lever. The notches (5) formed of deformation of material continue laterally from the connecting-arms at least along part of the U-arms (3,3').

Abstract (de)

Der Schwenkbeschlag besteht aus einem Rasthebel (2), einem Schwenkhebel (6) und einem Stützhebel (7). Der Stützhebel (7) ist im Rasthebel an einem Steuerteil (8) derart geführt, dass er aus verschiedenen Stützstellungen, in denen er in die Rasten eingreift, in eine Einschwenkstellung lenkbar ist, in der er ausser Eingriff mit den Rasten gehalten ist. Der Rasthebel (2) ist im Querschnitt etwa U-förmig ausgebildet und die Rasten bestehen aus Materialverformungen, welche im Verbindungssteg (4) und seitlich in den U-Schenkeln 3, 3' angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/045 (2013.01); A47C 20/043 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1159896 A1 20011205; EP 1159896 B1 20040630; DE 50006958 D1 20040805

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070510

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006958 P 20040805

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR LI

2002-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020226

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI