Global Patent Index - EP 1159898 A2

EP 1159898 A2 2001-12-05 - Display stand

Title (en)

Display stand

Title (de)

Aufsteller

Title (fr)

Présentoir

Publication

EP 1159898 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112728 A

Priority

DE 20009660 U

Abstract (en)

The goods presentation unit, particularly of cardboard or similar, has a basic part (12) extending vertically with outer walls (16) articulatedly connected to one another. At least one of the connecting lines (18) between two outer walls at least partly deviates from the vertical. The basic part initially comprises a flat, one-piece formation and after pivoting of the outer walls to form a closed outer walling structure is held together by an adhesive or insert tab (20) between the two end-side outer walls coming in contact with each other.

Abstract (de)

Ein Aufsteller zur Aufnahme einer zu präsentierenden Ware, insbesondere aus Karton oder dergleichen umfaßt ein als Sockel und/oder als Schütte dienendes, sich allgemein in Vertikalrichtung erstreckendes Basisteil, wobei die Außenwände des Basisteils gelenkig miteinander verbunden sind und wenigstens eine der zwischen zwei jeweiligen Außenwänden vorgesehenen Verbindungslinien zumindest teilweise einen von der Vertikalen abweichenden Verlauf besitzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 5/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 1/14 (2006.01); A47F 5/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/114 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20009660 U1 20000824; EP 1159898 A2 20011205; EP 1159898 A3 20020605

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021206

2003-04-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI