Global Patent Index - EP 1159903 A2

EP 1159903 A2 2001-12-05 - Tasting glass for alcoholic beverages

Title (en)

Tasting glass for alcoholic beverages

Title (de)

Verkostungsglas für alkoholische Destillate

Title (fr)

Verre à dégustation

Publication

EP 1159903 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01890157 A

Priority

AT 9372000 A

Abstract (en)

The tasting glass, for distilled alcohol beverage products, has a limited zone at the inner side with an enlarged surface area of 50-1000 mm<2>, over the base of the glass. The enlarged surface area is formed by roughening through sand and/or ball blasting, or by etching. Or it can be formed by an insert e.g. of sinter glass.

Abstract (de)

Verkostungsglas für alkoholische Destillate, wobei an der Innenseite des Glases ein begrenzter Bereich mit vergrößerter Oberfläche vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 19/2233 (2013.01); A47G 2400/045 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1159903 A2 20011205; EP 1159903 A3 20040811; AT 413938 B 20060715; AT A9372000 A 20051115

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050212

2005-06-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-05-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI