Global Patent Index - EP 1159909 A1

EP 1159909 A1 2001-12-05 - Shower booth

Title (en)

Shower booth

Title (de)

Duschkabine

Title (fr)

Cabine de douche

Publication

EP 1159909 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01401403 A

Priority

FR 0006916 A

Abstract (en)

The shower cabin has a modular structure, made up of shower trough (2), back wall (3) and front wall (4) containing the door. Strips to which spray heads are attached are mounted on the back wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/284 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1159909 A1 20011205; FR 2809609 A1 20011207; FR 2809609 B1 20020830

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050906

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050223

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020502

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI