Global Patent Index - EP 1159910 A1

EP 1159910 A1 2001-12-05 - Lavatory with multi-postioned seat

Title (en)

Lavatory with multi-postioned seat

Title (de)

Toilette mit einem Sitz für verschiedene Stellungen

Title (fr)

W.C. muni d'un abattant multi-positions

Publication

EP 1159910 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00500108 A

Priority

EP 00500108 A

Abstract (en)

The toilet has a seat (10) and lid (11) which are hinged on to one side of the toilet bowl (2). The cistern (3) has a recess (5) containing a spray outlet (6) operated by a button (8) on the cistern. This washes the front of the cistern and back of the toilet bowl, removing urine splashes produced by males urinating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1159910 A1 20011205

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050409

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041223

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI