Global Patent Index - EP 1159911 A2

EP 1159911 A2 2001-12-05 - Washing machine with through-flow water heating arrangement

Title (en)

Washing machine with through-flow water heating arrangement

Title (de)

Waschmaschine mit einem Durchlaufwassererhitzer

Title (fr)

Machine à laver avec chauffe-eau instantané

Publication

EP 1159911 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01106079 A

Priority

IT PN20000020 U

Abstract (en)

The washing machine comprises a conduit (9) in which the water is caused to circulate in a heat-exchange relation with heating means (11). In correspondence of a portion (12) of the conduit (9), in which there are provided said heating means (11), the same conduit features a reduced passage cross-section area, in such a manner as to cause the flow velocity of the water therethrough to increase and the deposit of dirt and limestone particles suspended in the water to be diminished. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42; D06F 39/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4285 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1159911 A2 20011205; EP 1159911 A3 20020828; IT 251739 Y1 20040120; IT PN20000020 U1 20011130

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI