Global Patent Index - EP 1159948 A2

EP 1159948 A2 2001-12-05 - Device for moving disabled persons

Title (en)

Device for moving disabled persons

Title (de)

Hilfsmittel zur Bewegung behinderter Personen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour faciliter le déplacement de personnes invalides

Publication

EP 1159948 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01113114 A

Priority

  • DE 20009948 U
  • DE 20020153 U

Abstract (en)

Movement aid (1) for disabled people comprises a seat (5) which is raised by a lifting device to transport a person sitting on the seat. The seat has a sitting surface consisting of one or more sitting surface parts (6, 7) having a lateral attachment (8) which moves in at least one essentially vertical guide rail (9). The attachment is designed so that when it moves in a vertical direction the sitting surface parts are rotated downward from the horizontal position into an at least almost vertical position. Preferred Features: Rotation of the sitting surface parts from the horizontal position is prevented by a stop when the attachment reaches the lowest position of the guide rail.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Hilfsmittel zur Bewegung behinderter Personen Hilfsmittel zur Bewegung behinderter Personen, wobei das Hilfsmittel einen Sitz aufweist, der mittels einer Hebevorrichtung anhebbar ist zum Transport einer auf dem Sitz sitzenden Person, wobei der Sitz eine Sitzfläche aus einem oder mehreren Sitzflächenteilen aufweist, das / die eine seitliche Anbringung aufweist / aufweisen, die in einer zumindest im wesentlichen vertikal laufenden Führungsschiene beweglich ist bzw. sind, wobei die Anbringung des Sitzflächenteiles bzw. der Sitzflächenteile derart ausgestaltet ist, dass das Sitzflächenteil bzw. die Sitzflächenteile bei der Vertikalbewegung der Anbringung der Sitzflächenteile aus der horizontalen Stellung mit einer Drehung nach unten in eine zumindest nahezu vertikale Stellung drehbar ist / sind. Alternativ oder zusätzlich kann die Sitzfläche um eine horizontale Achse im Rückenbereich des Sitzes nach unten klappbar sein, wobei in dieser geklappten Stellung die Sitzfläche zumindest im wesentlichen eine Verlängerung der Rückenlehne darstellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/1092 (2013.01); A61G 7/10 (2013.01); A61G 7/1098 (2013.01); A61G 5/14 (2013.01); A61G 2200/34 (2013.01); A61G 2200/36 (2013.01); A61G 2200/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20108868 U1 20010802; EP 1159948 A2 20011205; EP 1159948 A3 20030528

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031202

2004-03-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI