Global Patent Index - EP 1159987 A2

EP 1159987 A2 2001-12-05 - Cable brake

Title (en)

Cable brake

Title (de)

Seilbremse

Title (fr)

Frein de câble

Publication

EP 1159987 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112104 A

Priority

  • DE 10027559 A
  • DE 10047472 A
  • DE 10062785 A
  • DE 10063840 A

Abstract (en)

The cable brake, especially for cables of synthetic fibers e.g. climbing ropes, has a housing (10) with a guide with at least one passage opening (14,16) for at least one rope loop (20,22), and a moving bar (18) on a defined plane where the loops pass around it. The openings in the housing are elongated holes. The moving bar is at two edge sections (10b) of the housing and at a center housing section (10c), between the rope loop passage openings.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Seilbremse insbesondere für Kunstfaserseile wie Kletterseile oder dergleichen vorgeschlagen mit einem Gehäuse, welches eine Führungsvorrichtung für wenigstens ein Seil besitzt, die auf das Seil eine Bremswirkung auszuüben vermag. Die Führungsvorrichtung weist wenigstens eine Öffnung für den Durchtritt wenigstens einer Seilschlaufe sowie einen die Öffnung überspannenden, in der von der Seilschlaufe definierten Ebene beweglichen Steg auf, welcher innerhalb der Seilschlaufe verläuft zum Einklemmen des Seils unter Belastung in der Öffnung.. Am Gehäuse der Seilbremse ist zwecks besserer Dosierbarkeit der Bremskraft wenigstens eine weitere Aussparung vorgesehen zur zusätzlichen Führung und/oder Umlenkung eines Einfach- oder Doppelseils. Weiterhin ist am Gehäuse der Seilbremse wenigstens ein Anschlag für den Steg vorgesehen, welcher die Bewegung des Steges in der bei Belastung des Seils auftretenden Bewegungsrichtung des Steges vor Erreichen seiner durch die Verformbarkeit des Seils möglichen Endlage begrenzt. Eine die Neutrallage des Steges bestimmende Feder ist verdeckt im Gehäuse angeordnet, wodurch sich eine erhöhte Betriebssicherheit und einfachere Handhabung der Seilbremse ergibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 1/06 (2006.01); A63B 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 1/06 (2013.01); A63B 29/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1159987 A2 20011205; EP 1159987 A3 20020626; US 2001047912 A1 20011206; US 6607058 B2 20030819

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI