Global Patent Index - EP 1159990 A1

EP 1159990 A1 2001-12-05 - Interface for a snowboard

Title (en)

Interface for a snowboard

Title (de)

Trägerplatte für ein Snowboard

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rehaussement destiné à être monté sur une planche de glisse

Publication

EP 1159990 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01420112 A

Priority

FR 0006971 A

Abstract (en)

The heightening device to be installed on the upper face of a ski board comprises end parts forming slides (2,3) able to be fixed to the ski. The ski is fixed to the slides by bolts (32,34) passing through holes (33,35). Additional parts (4,5) can be fixed to the ski.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/128 (2013.01); A63C 9/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1159990 A1 20011205; FR 2809634 A1 20011207; FR 2809634 B1 20020712; US 2002130490 A1 20020919

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090910

2008-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080311

2006-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SKIS ROSSIGNOL

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR

2002-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020128

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI