Global Patent Index - EP 1159994 A2

EP 1159994 A2 2001-12-05 - Game service provision device and method

Title (en)

Game service provision device and method

Title (de)

Spieldienstbereitstellungeinrichtung und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Système et procédé de mise à disposition de service

Publication

EP 1159994 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01304312 A

Priority

JP 2000163567 A

Abstract (en)

In addition to an optional game service in accordance with a designation made by a player, a compulsory game service not directly related to the designation by the player can be provided. A game service provision device is configured so as to perform the steps of receiving a game service request from a player (S101), transmitting a game service designation request to said player in response to said game service request (S104), receiving a game service designation transmitted from said player in response to said game service designation request for designating at least one of a plurality of game services (S105), transmitting the game service designated by said game service designation to said player as an optional game service (S106), and transmitting to said player a compulsory game service selected from said plurality of game services based on predetermined basic information associated with said player at a predetermined probability instead of said game service designation request when said game service request is received (S106-S108). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/00 (2006.01); A63F 13/10 (2006.01); A63F 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/60 (2014.09); A63F 13/12 (2013.01); A63F 13/79 (2014.09); A63F 13/80 (2014.09); A63F 13/332 (2014.09); A63F 13/335 (2014.09); A63F 2300/406 (2013.01); A63F 2300/407 (2013.01); A63F 2300/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1159994 A2 20011205; EP 1159994 A3 20031203; EP 1159994 B1 20071107; CN 1190248 C 20050223; CN 1325749 A 20011212; DE 60131219 D1 20071220; DE 60131219 T2 20081106; HK 1038323 A1 20080328; JP 2001340652 A 20011211; JP 3763119 B2 20060405; TW 592775 B 20040621; US 2001049304 A1 20011206; US 6565437 B2 20030520

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150515

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60131219

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-09 [REG FR RM] CORRECTION OF A MATERIAL ERROR

2008-11-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-11-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080808

2008-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-03-28 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1038323

2007-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60131219 P 20071220

2007-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-11-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050309

2004-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040525

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONAMI CORPORATION

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KCE TOKYO INC.

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI