Global Patent Index - EP 1160020 A1

EP 1160020 A1 2001-12-05 - Suction device

Title (en)

Suction device

Title (de)

Absaugvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'aspiration

Publication

EP 1160020 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01107136 A

Priority

DE 10026601 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: UA67797C2] The exhaust ventilation (1) is intended for removal of gases, in particular, air and/or smoke. It has a swirl chamber (3) in the housing (2) with at least one inflow opening (4), at least two connected to the swirl chamber (3) suction branch pipes (5, 6) and at least one system of removal. The system of removal is a collector (7, 8) as a part of the housing (2), at that the swirl chamber (3) is connected to the collector (7, 8) with suction branch pipes (5, 6). At operation in the swirl chamber (3) between the suction branch pipes (5, 6) stable swirled flow is formed. The outer side (9, 10) of the collectors (7, 8) at least in part is a directing surface for the flow. To provide the streamlining of the housing (2) it is given in cross-section an S-like shape in the area of the collectors (7, 8) and the swirl chamber (3).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Absaugvorrichtung (1) zum Absaugen von Gasen, insbesondere Luft und/oder Rauch, mit einer wenigstens eine Zuströmöffnung (4) aufweisenden Wirbelkammer (3) in einem Gehäuse (2), mit wenigstens zwei in die Wirbelkammer (3) mündenden Absaugöffnungen (5, 6) und mit einem wenigstens eine Absaugkammer (7, 8) als Teil des Gehäuses (2) aufweisenden Absaugsystem, wobei die Wirbelkammer (3) über die Absaugöffnungen (5, 6) mit der Absaugkammer (7, 8) verbunden ist, wobei sich während des Absaugbetriebes in der Wirbelkammer (3) eine stabilisierte Drallströmung zwischen den Absaugöffnungen ( 5, 6) ausbildet und wobei die in die Zuströmöffnung (4) führende Außenseite (9, 10) der Absaugkammer (7, 8) zumindest teilweise als Strömungsleitfläche ausgebildet ist. Um eine Absaugvorrichtung der eingangs genannten Art zur Verfügung zu stellen, die in strömungstechnischer Hinsicht optimiert ist, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß das Gehäuse (2) im Bereich der Absaugkammer (7, 8) und der Wirbelkammer (3) im Querschnitt S-förmig ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/20 (2006.01); B08B 15/00 (2006.01); E21F 1/00 (2006.01); F15D 1/00 (2006.01); F24F 7/04 (2006.01); F24F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 15/00 (2013.01); E21F 1/003 (2013.01); F15D 1/0015 (2013.01); F24F 2007/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10026601 C1 20010809; AT 240794 T 20030615; BR 0004055 A 20020213; CZ 20011841 A3 20020213; CZ 297777 B6 20070328; EP 1160020 A1 20011205; EP 1160020 B1 20030521; HU 0102269 A2 20020629; HU 0102269 A3 20020828; HU 0102269 D0 20010828; HU 222870 B1 20031229; PL 199929 B1 20081128; PL 347231 A1 20011203; RU 2206417 C2 20030620; SK 285596 B6 20070405; SK 7292001 A3 20021203; UA 67797 C2 20011217

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180314

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50100251

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060322

2005-03-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *THYSSENKRUPP HISERV G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-05-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040322

2003-12-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1160020E

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-09-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-08-21 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-08-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-08-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100251 P 20030626

2003-06-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP HISERV GMBH

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020201

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI