Global Patent Index - EP 1160028 A1

EP 1160028 A1 2001-12-05 - Continuous casting method with rolls and relative device

Title (en)

Continuous casting method with rolls and relative device

Title (de)

Stranggiessverfahren mit Rollen und entsprechende Anlage

Title (fr)

Coulée continue avec des cylindres et dispositif correspondant

Publication

EP 1160028 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01112792 A

Priority

IT UD20000114 A

Abstract (en)

Continuous casting method and device (10) with rolls for plane products such as strips (13), wherein counter-rotating rolls (11) are partly immersed in a container (21) containing molten metal (22), said rolls (11) being arranged parallel and adjacent to define a gap (12) through which the strip (13) to be produced is extracted upward, said strip (13) being formed by the union of two semi-skins which are formed on the respective surfaces of said rolls (11) and are joined together in correspondence with a line of contact (30), said method providing that shearing means (27), arranged substantially in cooperation with the periphery of said rolls (11), act on the sides of said strip (13) to define at least the width of said strip (13) extracted from said rolls (11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06; B22D 11/126

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/06 (2006.01); B22D 11/126 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0625 (2013.01); B22D 11/126 (2013.01); B21B 1/463 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 4438118 C1 19960613 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
  • [A] WO 9912677 A1 19990318 - DANIELI OFF MECC [IT], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 196 (M - 497) 10 July 1986 (1986-07-10)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 176 (M - 491) 20 June 1986 (1986-06-20)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 08 29 August 1997 (1997-08-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 01 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

US 2001050158 A1 20011213; EP 1160028 A1 20011205; IT 1314817 B1 20030116; IT UD20000114 A1 20011203

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030805

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR IT

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020529

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI