Global Patent Index - EP 1160030 A1

EP 1160030 A1 2001-12-05 - Device for casting molten metal

Title (en)

Device for casting molten metal

Title (de)

Vergiesseinrichtung für flüssiges Metall

Title (fr)

Dispoistif pour couler un métal en fusion

Publication

EP 1160030 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01112233 A

Priority

DE 20009599 U

Abstract (en)

A casting vessel has a raised tap hole opening region (4) conforming with a stopper bottom recess (7) for closing the tap hole (2). A molten metal casting vessel has a bottom tap hole (2) which can be closed by a vertically movable stopper (5) and which has a raised region (4) about its opening (3) facing the ladle interior so that the opening (3) is located above the ladle bottom (1), the stopper (5) having a corresponding recessed region (7) at its base (6) for conforming with the raised region to close the tap hole (2).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vergießeinrichtung für flüssiges Metall, in deren Boden ein Ausguß (2) zum Entleeren der Vergießeinrichtung vorgesehen ist, dessen Öffnung (3) durch eine in vertikaler Richtung bewegliche Tauchglocke (5) verschließar ist. Bei dem Vergießen von flüssigem Metall entsteht das Problem, daß beim nicht rechtzeitigen Beenden des Gießvorganges Schlacke am Ende des Gießvorganges austritt, und die jeweiligen Chargen verunreinigt. Wird andererseits der Gießvorgang zu früh abgebrochen, verbleibt Metall ungenutzt in der Vergießeinrichtung. Diese Aufgabe wird erfindungsgemäß dadurch gelöst, daß der Ausguß (2) um seine dem Innenbereich der Vergießeinrichtung zugewandte Öffnung (3) eine Erhebung (4) aufweist, so daß die Öffnung oberhalb des Bodens der Vergießeinrichtung angeordnet ist und daß die Tauchglocke (5) an ihrer Unterseite (6) eine der Erhebung (4) entsprechende Aussparung (7) aufweist, so daß der Ausguß (2) durch die Tauchglocke (5) formschlüssig verschließbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 41/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 20009599 U1 20001012; DE 50111665 D1 20070201; EP 1160030 A1 20011205; EP 1160030 B1 20061220

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070518

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070519

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070921

2007-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50111665 P 20070201

2006-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2006-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HETSCH, WALTER

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050210

2002-11-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HETSCH, WALTER

2002-11-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHWANKE, WALTER

2002-10-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2002-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020810

2002-10-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY LI

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HETSCH, HERR WALTER

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHWANKE, WALTER

2002-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI