Global Patent Index - EP 1160054 A1

EP 1160054 A1 2001-12-05 - Apparatus for machining cylindrical journals on workpieces by means of an abrasive belt

Title (en)

Apparatus for machining cylindrical journals on workpieces by means of an abrasive belt

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Bearbeiten von zylindrischen Laufflächen mittels eines Schleifbandes

Title (fr)

Machine d'usinage par bande abrasive de portées cylindriques sur des pièces

Publication

EP 1160054 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01401124 A

Priority

FR 0005727 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2001041523A1] A machine for grinding cylindrical bearing surfaces on parts, in particular journals and/or crank pins on crankshafts, using an abrasive belt, includes a support on which three abrasive belt clamping members are mounted in a triangle and mobile in directions that converge toward the axis of the bearing surface to be ground. Each clamping member carries at least one applicator shoe conformed to press the abrasive belt against the bearing surface along a surface essentially limited to a generatrix parallel to the axis of the bearing surface. The shoe is preferably made from an elastomer having a Shore hardness at most equal to 100 and has a cylindrically curved applicator surface with a radius of curvature less than the radius of curvature of the bearing surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 5/42; B24B 21/00; B24B 21/02; B24B 35/00; B24B 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/42 (2006.01); B24B 21/00 (2006.01); B24B 21/02 (2006.01); B24B 35/00 (2006.01); B24B 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 21/004 (2013.01); B24B 5/42 (2013.01); B24B 21/02 (2013.01); B24B 35/00 (2013.01); B24B 41/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 2001041523 A1 20011115; US 6454638 B2 20020924; DE 60126707 D1 20070405; DE 60126707 T2 20071031; EP 1160054 A1 20011205; EP 1160054 B1 20070221; ES 2282212 T3 20071016; FR 2808463 A1 20011109; FR 2808463 B1 20020913; JP 2001353652 A 20011225

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080503

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080503

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070516

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071122

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2282212 T3

2007-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070522

2007-06-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070612

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-05-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60126707 P 20070405

2007-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-02-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BONACHERA, RICHARD

2007-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MILLOT, RAYMOND

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI