Global Patent Index - EP 1160055 A2

EP 1160055 A2 2001-12-05 - Grinding body

Title (en)

Grinding body

Title (de)

Schleifkörper

Title (fr)

Elément de polissage

Publication

EP 1160055 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01810502 A

Priority

DE 10026936 A

Abstract (en)

The casing (5) is partially filled with packing material (12) comprising solid particles.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schleifschuh für insbesondere unebene Oberflächen weist ein Halteteil (1), ein Schleifmittel (3) und eine das Schleifmittel (3) tragende Hülle (5) auf. Damit der Schleifschuh für verschiedene unebene und ebene Oberflächen angewendet werden kann, ist die Hülle (5) flexibel ausgebildet und ist teilweise, mit als Schüttgut vorliegenden, Festkörperpartikeln (12) gefüllt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 23/04; B24D 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 29/00 (2006.01); B24B 23/00 (2006.01); B24D 9/00 (2006.01); B24D 15/02 (2006.01); B24D 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 9/00 (2013.01); B24D 15/04 (2013.01); Y10S 451/913 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160055 A2 20011205; EP 1160055 A3 20031022; DE 10026936 A1 20011206; JP 2002018697 A 20020122; US 2001049257 A1 20011206; US 6443825 B2 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040423

2004-08-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24B 23/04 A

2003-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24D 15/04 B

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI