Global Patent Index - EP 1160057 A1

EP 1160057 A1 2001-12-05 - Hammer drilling machine

Title (en)

Hammer drilling machine

Title (de)

Handgeführter Bohrhammer

Title (fr)

Foreuse à percussion

Publication

EP 1160057 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111730 A

Priority

EP 00111730 A

Abstract (en)

A hand-operated hammer drill has a tool spindle (1) turning on an axis of rotation (2) and oscillating towards this axis. This spindle slides lengthwise and holds a drill bit or a tool. In a hammer drill casing (43) there is an electric drive motor (3) to generate rotational motion in the spindle and a striking tool (4) to create an oscillating lengthwise slide motion in the spindle.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen handgeführten Bohrhammer mit einer um eine Drehachse (2) drehbaren und in Richtung der Drehachse (2) oszillierend längsverschieblichen Werkzeugspindel (1) zur Aufnahme eines Bohrers, eines Meißels oder dergleichen. In einem Gehäuse (43) des Bohrhammers ist ein elektrischer Antriebsmotor (3) zur Erzeugung der Drehbewegung der Werkzeugspindel (2) und ein Schlagwerk (4) zur Erzeugung der oszillierenden Längsverschiebung der Werkzeugspindel (2) angeordnet. Das Schlagwerk (4) ist hydraulisch angetrieben. Der hydraulische Druck wird von einer im Gehäuse (43) angeordneten Hydraulikpumpe (17) erzeugt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25D 9/12 (2006.01); B25D 9/14 (2006.01); B25D 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 9/145 (2013.01); B25D 9/125 (2013.01); B25D 11/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160057 A1 20011205; US 2002000325 A1 20020103

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071114

2007-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070703

2005-04-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: A & M ELECTRIC TOOLS GMBH

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020525

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI