Global Patent Index - EP 1160064 A1

EP 1160064 A1 2001-12-05 - Tray-like mould for the manufacture of concrete slabs

Title (en)

Tray-like mould for the manufacture of concrete slabs

Title (de)

Tablett-ähnliche Schalungsform zur Herstellung von Betonplatten

Title (fr)

Moule en forme de plateau pour fabriquer des plaques en béton

Publication

EP 1160064 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01112657 A

Priority

IT TV20000025 U

Abstract (en)

A tray-like mould for the manufacture of concrete slabs which is obtained from a plastic material such as ABS which is provided at the outer surface of its bottom wall (10) with several stiffening ribs (16A, 16B, 16C) and is furthermore provided with means (18) ensuring a centred stacking of various moulds on top of each other in a steam-tight manner. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 7/22; B28B 7/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/348 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160064 A1 20011205; EP 1160064 B1 20060308; DE 60117636 D1 20060504; DE 60117636 T2 20070118; ES 2257356 T3 20060801; IT 251479 Y1 20031119; IT TV20000025 U1 20011130

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180601

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070525

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061211

2006-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2257356 T3

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60117636 P 20060504

2006-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041001

2002-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH LI

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020508

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI